MA H3941 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to debt authorization for the roof replacement project at the Pathfinder Regional Vocational-Technical High School District. Education.
Title
Relative to the Pathfinder Regional Vocational-Technical High School District
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | Enacted |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-05-19 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-05-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 02:30 PM-03:30 PM in B-2 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Education |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3941 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3941.pdf |