MA H3930 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2557
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the appointment of special police officers in the town of Maynard
Title
Authorizing the appointment of special police officers in the town of Maynard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2025-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2024-12-30 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-12-30 | House | Enacted |
2024-12-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2024-12-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2024-12-26 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2024-12-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-10-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-07-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-07-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-07-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-06-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-20 | House | New draft of H2557 |
2023-06-20 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2557 (Replaces) 2023-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3930
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3930 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3930.pdf |