MA H393 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Roy of Franklin, a petition of Jeffrey N. Roy, Michael J. Soter and Joseph D. McKenna that the Massachusetts Technology Park Corporation establish an entrepreneur learner's permit program. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To establish an entrepreneur learner's permit program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S209 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S159 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
H229 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
S159 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
H229 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H393 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H393.pdf |