MA H3923 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Accompanied S2125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Accompanied S2125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the wages of certain covered commercial service employees at Logan International Airport. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to fair wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Accompanied S2125 |
2016-02-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-12-23 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2125 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3845 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3845 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3923 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3923.pdf |