MA H3914 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Murray of Milford, a petition of Brian W. Murray that the Secretary of the Commonwealth create and maintain a municipal public legal notice website to be available for viewing and searching by the general public. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to publication of notice by municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4675 |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4470 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107
H4788 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2827 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4470 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107
H4788 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2827 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3914 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3914.pdf |