MA H3913 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the town of Danvers Electric Light Division. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the town of Danvers Electric Light Division
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-23 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-04-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-04-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3751 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2022
H4959 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5032
H5032 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5162
H5162 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2022
H4959 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5032
H5032 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5162
H5162 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3913 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3913.pdf |