MA H3912 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1535

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a local option gasoline and diesel fuel excise

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a local option gasoline and diesel fuel excise

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-21HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2017-09-21HouseNew draft of S1535, H1603, H3702 and H3707
2017-09-21HouseReported from the committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H1603 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H1611 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1605 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1607 (Similar To) 2017-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1499 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4000
S1535 (Replaces) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback