MA H3898 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4128
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 91-22-1)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Cantwell of Marshfield, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of James M. Cantwell and others for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study behavioral health promotion and upstream prevention. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission on behavioral health promotion and upstream prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4128 |
2016-02-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-12-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
2015-11-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4128 (Replaced by) 2016-07-28 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2103 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H332 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
H2104 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
H1223 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1084 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
H2103 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H332 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
H2104 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
H1223 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1084 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3898 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3898.pdf |