MA H3892 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lexington be authorized to establish transit improvement districts. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Lexington to establish transit improvement districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5218 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 25, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-30 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3893 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2324 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H4314 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4876 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5218 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2324 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H4314 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4876 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5218 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3892.pdf |