MA H3881 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. LeBoeuf of Worcester, a petition of David Henry Argosky LeBoeuf and others that the Department of Housing and Community Development establish a rental assistance program for certain persons over the age of 75 years. Housing.
Title
Relative to protections and housing opportunities for seniors
Sponsors
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5089 |
2019-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
S366 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2684
H600 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
S2414 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S366 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2684
H600 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
S2414 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3881 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3881.pdf |