MA H3875 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 330 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 330 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of Jeanine Bonnayer as a police officer in the town of Ware, notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting Jeanine Bonnayer from the maximum age requirement for applying for civil service appointment as a police officer in the town of Ware
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Sen. Stephen Brewer [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 330 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-11-19 | House | Enacted |
2012-11-15 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-11-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-10-09 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-10-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-01-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3875 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17774&generalCourtId=1 |