MA H3864 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the regular compensation of certain active and retired employees of the city of Fitchburg. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regular compensation of certain active and retired employees of the city of Fitchburg

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-04-16HouseRules suspended
2024-04-16HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-03-18HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-22SenateSenate concurred
2023-05-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback