MA H3854 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2563
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Whately to continue the employment of fire department member Gary Stone
Title
Authorizing the town of Whately to continue the employment of fire department member Gary Stone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-10-20 | House | Enacted |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-08-26 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-06-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-01 | House | New draft of H2563 |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2563 (Replaces) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3854
H2564 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H3855 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2021
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4206 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2022
H4356 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4593
H2564 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H3855 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2021
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4206 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2022
H4356 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4593
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3854 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3854.pdf |