MA H385 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a student entrepreneurial and economic investment fund to provide an opportunity for interested students to gain entrepreneurial and early-stage business development experience and establish a relationship between the public higher education system and the business community. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the student entrepreneurial and economic investment fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-16JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S235 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H547 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1291 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback