MA H3849 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contractor liability for unpermitted construction. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to contractor liability for unpermitted construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4469 |
2021-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4469 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3849 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3849.pdf |