MA H3845 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to marking of buildings with light-frame truss-type construction. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Related to light frame truss marking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3845 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3845.pdf |