MA H3843 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4291
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Deerfield be authorized to continue the employment of police department members Michael W. Habel, Robert A Thratcher and Mark Jacques. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Deerfield to continue the employment of police department members Michael W. Habel, Robert A Thratcher, and Mark Jacques
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4291 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4291 (Replaced by) 2024-04-16 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4557
H4557 (Similar To) 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2024
H4557 (Similar To) 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3843 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3843.pdf |