MA H3835 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4596
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to coastal and environmental acidification and nutrient pollution. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To overcome coastal and environmental acidification and nutrient pollution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4596 |
2021-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4596 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3835 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3835.pdf |