MA H3829 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting affordable health care options.
Title
Promoting affordable health care options
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4605 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3655 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3671 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H530 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2343 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4605 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
H3655 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3671 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H530 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2343 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4605 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3829 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3829.pdf |