MA H3828 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H250

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Lieutenant Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the town of Mansfield to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Mansfield to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-27 Signed by the Lieutenant Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2023
2023-06-22SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2023-06-22HouseEnacted
2023-06-22SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-06-22SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2023-06-20SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2023-06-15HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-05-25HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-05-25HouseRules suspended
2023-05-25HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-05-08HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-05-08HouseNew draft of H250
2023-05-08HouseReported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H250 (Replaces) 2023-05-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3828
H4035 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4191
H4588 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4688

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback