MA H3820 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3800
Note: Legislation replaced by H3828
Note: Legislation replaced by H3828
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 8 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2018 (see House, No. 3800), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment D of House, No. 3828). July 17, 2017.
Title
Establishing the Nickerson State Park Trust Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2018-05-07 | House | Re-enacted |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-05-07 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Governor's amendment adopted, in concurrence |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-04 | House | Amendment recommended by the Governor adopted (in the form approved by the committee) |
2017-10-04 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2017-07-19 | House | For message, see H3828, Attachment D |
2017-07-19 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2017-07-19 | House | Enacted as section 8 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H3800 |
Same As/Similar To
H3800 (Replaced by) 2017-11-14 - Item 8910-0108 passed over veto - see Roll Call #298 [YEAS 32 to NAYS 6]
H3828 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2104 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
S10 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Amendment again agreed to -- see Senate Roll Call #47 [YEAS 29 - NAYS 7] see House Roll Call #67 [YEAS 105 - NAYS 48]
S19 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - See H2019
S18 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Report accepted, as amended
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H3898 (Similar To) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2018
H3899 (Similar To) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 303 of the Acts of 2018
H50 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
H4110 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4163 (Similar To) 2018-09-10 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3828 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2104 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
S10 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Amendment again agreed to -- see Senate Roll Call #47 [YEAS 29 - NAYS 7] see House Roll Call #67 [YEAS 105 - NAYS 48]
S19 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - See H2019
S18 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Report accepted, as amended
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H3898 (Similar To) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2018
H3899 (Similar To) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 303 of the Acts of 2018
H50 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
H4110 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4163 (Similar To) 2018-09-10 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3820 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3820.pdf |