MA H3819 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(by vote of the town) that the town of Hanover be authorized to establish a post employment benefits trust
Title
Authorizing the Town of Hanover to Establish an Other Post Employment Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2009-08-03 | Enacted | |
2009-07-30 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-07-30 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | |
2009-07-17 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-07-14 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-07-13 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-07-08 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-07-06 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-06-24 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3819 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=4434&generalCourtId=2 |