MA H3816 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to children’s advocacy centers and the creation of a children’s alliance. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to children’s advocacy centers and the Massachusetts children’s alliance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-08-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2021-05-27 | House | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2021-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Same As/Similar To
S95 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3816 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3816.pdf |