MA H3815 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Lynnfield be authorized to exempt the position of sealer of weights and measures from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting the position of sealer of weights and measures within the town of Lynnfield from the Civil Service Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2019
2019-08-12SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-08-12HouseEnacted
2019-08-08SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2019-08-08SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-07-25SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-07-23HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2019-07-16HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-07-16HouseRules suspended
2019-07-16HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-07-15HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-05-28SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3916 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
H4042 (Similar To) 2019-08-12 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback