MA H4042 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city known as the town of West Springfield be authorized to exempt certain positions in said town from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting certain positions in the city known as the town of West Springfield from the civil service law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-12HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-11-12HouseRules suspended
2019-11-12HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-11-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-08-12SenateSenate concurred
2019-08-08HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4053 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4054 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4082 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback