MA H3810 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dissolving the Hampshire County Regional Housing Authority and incorporating its functions into the Northampton Housing Authority. Housing.
Title
Dissolving the Hampshire County Regional Housing Authority and incorporating its functions into the Northampton Housing Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-02-22 | House | Enacted |
2024-02-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2575 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read second |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2023-11-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-10-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-10-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2023-04-25 | House | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2023-04-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Same As/Similar To
S2575 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - See H3810
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3810 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3810.pdf |