MA H3780 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2655
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing the volunteer service tax reduction for seniors
Title
Enhancing the volunteer service tax reduction for seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-09-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-30 | House | New draft of H2655 |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2655 (Replaces) 2015-09-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3780
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3780 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3780.pdf |