MA H3759 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the targeted local contribution of the foundation budget under the chapter 70 funding formula, so called. Education.
Title
Relative to the foundation budget's targeted local contribution
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H485 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S310 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H500 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H449 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S310 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H500 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H449 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3759 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3759.pdf |