MA H3759 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2339
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on September 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-14 - See H2339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-14 - See H2339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his objections thereto in writing the engrossed Bill authorizing the appointment of retired police officers as special police officers in the city of Boston [see House, No. 2339] (for message, see House, No. 3759). September 11, 2015.
Title
A message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his objections thereto in writing the engrossed Bill authorizing the appointment of retired police officers as special police officers in the city of Boston [see House, No. 2339] (for message, see House, No. 3759). September 11, 2015.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-14 | House | See H2339 |
Same As/Similar To
H2339 (Replaced by) 2015-11-05 - Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2015
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3759 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3759.pdf |