MA H3754 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain professional licensure training requirements. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to certain professional licensure training requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3194 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Resolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
H3194 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Resolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3754.pdf |