MA H3747 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Revenue to collect a surcharge for 911 services from the end users of prepaid wireless services at the point of sale on each retail sale. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a prepaid wireless E911 surcharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4443 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 15, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-21 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-08-27 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4443 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3747 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3747.pdf |