MA H3734 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on August 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for David Senatillaka, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for David Senatillaka, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-08-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-08-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-06-23 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2017-06-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3647 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2017
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
H3723 (Similar To) 2017-07-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2017
H3720 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2017
H1464 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2017
H3645 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2017
H3651 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2017
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1419 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2577 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3923 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3949
H3924 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3943
H3922 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2017
H3929 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3947 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2018
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
H4044 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4090 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2018
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4372 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2018
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
H3723 (Similar To) 2017-07-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2017
H3720 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2017
H1464 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2017
H3645 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2017
H3651 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2017
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1419 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2577 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3923 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3949
H3924 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3943
H3922 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2017
H3929 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3947 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2018
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
H4044 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4090 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2018
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4372 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3734 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3734.pdf |