MA H3733 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5126
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to vehicle registration plates of veterans. Transportation.
Title
Relative to vehicle registration plates of veterans
Sponsors
Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Sen. Peter Durant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5126 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3098 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3733 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3733.pdf |