MA H3730 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3968
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3968
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3968
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for immediate capital improvement needs of the Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for immediate capital improvement needs of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3968 |
2017-09-22 | House | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-06-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Same As/Similar To
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3655 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3671 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H3968 (Replaced by) 2017-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H4018
H4092 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2244 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - See H4045
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1471 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H906 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
H3655 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3671 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H3968 (Replaced by) 2017-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H4018
H4092 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2244 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - See H4045
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1471 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H906 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3730 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3730.pdf |