MA H3707 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensing of mental health counselors. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Expanding licensure opportunity for school counselors
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H420 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3707 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3707.pdf |