MA H3697 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 304 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 304 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain roadways in the town of Dartmouth. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Dartmouth to accept certain roadways as public ways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 304 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-08-14 | House | Enacted |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-01-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-11-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-11-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-10-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3697 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3697.pdf |