MA H3697 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-25 - See H04136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-25 - See H04136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
(by vote of the town) that the town of Norton be authorized to transfer certain park land in said town
Title
(by vote of the town) that the town of Norton be authorized to transfer certain park land in said town
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | See H04136 | |
2009-06-25 | New draft substituted, see H4136 | |
2009-06-25 | Read third | |
2009-05-14 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-05-11 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-05-07 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 4/28 at 10:00 AM in Hearing Room A1 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h03697.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht03/ht03697.htm |