MA H3696 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S695
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an apprenticeship program to ready vacant public housing apartments for occupancy
Title
To establish an apprenticeship program to ready vacant public housing apartments for occupancy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-07-30 | House | New draft of S695 and H1108 |
2015-07-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S695 (Replaces) 2015-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3696
S1984 (Similar To) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2016
S2383 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2202 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3903 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4209 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1984 (Similar To) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2016
S2383 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2202 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3903 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4209 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3696 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3696.pdf |