MA H3692 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Hunt of Boston, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Daniel J. Hunt and others for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor to designate the last full week in April as building trades opioids awareness week. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing Building Trades Opioids Awareness Week

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred
2019-04-16HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback