MA H3644 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Diggs of Barnstable, a petition of Kip A. Diggs and Steven George Xiarhos (with the approval of the county commissioners) that Jeffrey H. Jackson be authorized to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing Jeffrey H. Jackson to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-18SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2023-12-14HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-10-30HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-10-30HouseRules suspended
2023-10-30HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-10-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-04-04JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2399 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4494 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4219 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback