MA H3635 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Dennis be authorized to establish a department of municipal finance. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a department of municipal finance in the town of Dennis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-02-18 | House | Enacted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-11-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-08-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-08-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-08-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-08-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H896 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3948
H3636 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3948 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
H3636 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3948 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3635 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3635.pdf |