MA H3625 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to discriminatory housing practices in the city of Boston. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the powers of the Boston Housing Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Byron Rushing [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] |
Rep. Carlo Basile [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Enacted |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-17 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-08-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3625 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3625.pdf |