MA H3590 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to modify weekly workers' compensation disability benefits. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modify weekly workers' compensation disability benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-06-27JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H1598 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1063 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2311
S1077 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2429
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2240 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1621 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4026
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback