MA H3579 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Mashpee to convey an interest in certain town owned land to the town of Barnstable By Mr. Vieira of Falmouth, a petition of David T. Vieira (by vote of the town) that the town of Mashpee be authorized to convey an interest in certain land to the town of Barnstable. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Mashpee to convey an interest in certain town owned land to the town of Barnstable
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #228 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2013-11-20 | House | Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 273) |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-11-20 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House further amendment |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2013-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read and placed in the Order of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-09-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-09-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-09-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-07-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3579 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3579.pdf |