MA H3578 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the inspector of plumbing and gas fitting in the town of South Hadley. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the inspector of plumbing and gas fitting in the town of South Hadley
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-11-06 | House | Enacted |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-09-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-09-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-07-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3578 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3578.pdf |