MA H3559 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a hospital merger market impact review Section 19 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2014 (see House, No. 3538), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment D of House, No. 3566). July 12, 2013.
Title
Relative to a hospital merger market impact review
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Re-enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-07-31 | House | Re-enacted |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-07-30 | Senate | House further amendment adopted |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Governors amendment rejected |
2013-07-30 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-07-30 | House | Governors amendment rejected |
2013-07-30 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2013-07-15 | House | For message, see H3566, attachment D |
2013-07-15 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2013-07-15 | House | Enacted as section 19 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H3538 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3559 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3559.pdf |