MA H3542 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to revive and continue the special legislative commission established (under Section 107 of Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2020) to study and examine the civil service law. Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently.
Title
Relative to reviving the special legislative commission established to study and examine the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3749 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H3731 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H3877 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
S2396 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - House concurred
H3999 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H3731 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H3877 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
S2396 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - House concurred
H3999 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3542 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3542.pdf |