MA H3519 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Lipper-Garabedian of Melrose, a petition of Kate Lipper-Garabedian and others that the Board of Registration in Nursing be authorized to establish a waiver program for military personnel who satisfactorily complete medical training offered through the military. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to waiving education requirements for skilled veterans to be LPNs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S2327 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4671 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #182 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0)

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback