MA H3515 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring notation of do not resuscitate orders on electronic medical records. Public Health.
Title
Requiring notation of do not resuscitate orders on electronic medical records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4625 |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1214 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S651 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3227 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S651 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3227 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3515.pdf |