MA H3514 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a National Guard enlistment enhancement program. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
To establish the Guard enlistment enhancement program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2313 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3485 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1752 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2951 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2337 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
H3485 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1752 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2951 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2337 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3514 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3514.pdf |